Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3447 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gutierrez (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3447
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment and functions of certain urban land
 bank demonstration programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 379C.002, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 379C.002.  APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies only to
 home-rule municipalities that:
 (1)  have a population of 1.18 million or more; and
 (2)  are located predominantly in a county that has a
 total area of less than 1,300 [1,000] square miles.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *