Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3470 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 2, 2013      TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3470 by Bohac (Relating to a disclosure by an attorney before accepting representation of a client in a suit for the dissolution of marriage.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Family Code to require that prospective clients of attorneys in marriage dissolution suits receive a disclosure notice. The bill would require that the State Bar of Texas adopt the required disclosure no later than January 1, 2014. The bill specifies that the disclosure requirement would go into effect March 1, 2014. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013. The State Bar of Texas does not anticipate a significant fiscal impact resulting from the bill. It is not anticipated that the bill will result in any significant fiscal impact to the court system. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 302 Office of the Attorney General   LBB Staff:  UP, AM, CL    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 2, 2013





  TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3470 by Bohac (Relating to a disclosure by an attorney before accepting representation of a client in a suit for the dissolution of marriage.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3470 by Bohac (Relating to a disclosure by an attorney before accepting representation of a client in a suit for the dissolution of marriage.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3470 by Bohac (Relating to a disclosure by an attorney before accepting representation of a client in a suit for the dissolution of marriage.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB3470 by Bohac (Relating to a disclosure by an attorney before accepting representation of a client in a suit for the dissolution of marriage.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Family Code to require that prospective clients of attorneys in marriage dissolution suits receive a disclosure notice. The bill would require that the State Bar of Texas adopt the required disclosure no later than January 1, 2014. The bill specifies that the disclosure requirement would go into effect March 1, 2014. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013. The State Bar of Texas does not anticipate a significant fiscal impact resulting from the bill. It is not anticipated that the bill will result in any significant fiscal impact to the court system.

The bill would amend the Family Code to require that prospective clients of attorneys in marriage dissolution suits receive a disclosure notice. The bill would require that the State Bar of Texas adopt the required disclosure no later than January 1, 2014. The bill specifies that the disclosure requirement would go into effect March 1, 2014. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013.

The State Bar of Texas does not anticipate a significant fiscal impact resulting from the bill. It is not anticipated that the bill will result in any significant fiscal impact to the court system.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 302 Office of the Attorney General

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 302 Office of the Attorney General

LBB Staff: UP, AM, CL

 UP, AM, CL