H.B. No. 3520 AN ACT relating to the designation of a segment of U.S. Highway 75 in Dallas County as the George W. Bush Expressway. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 225.0331 to read as follows: Sec. 225.0331. GEORGE W. BUSH EXPRESSWAY. (a) Notwithstanding Section 225.001(c), the portion of U.S. Highway 75 in Dallas County between its intersection with Knox Street/North Henderson Avenue and its intersection with Northwest Highway is designated as the George W. Bush Expressway. The designation is in addition to any other designation. (b) Subject to Subsection (d), the department shall: (1) design and construct markers indicating the designation as the George W. Bush Expressway and any other appropriate information; and (2) erect a marker at each end of the highway and at appropriate intermediate sites along the highway. (c) The department shall accept a grant or donation made to assist in financing the construction and maintenance of a marker under this section. (d) The department may not design, construct, or erect a marker under this section unless a grant or donation of funds is made to the department to cover the cost of the design, construction, and erection of the marker. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3520 was passed by the House on May 8, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 3520 on May 24, 2013, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3520 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3520 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3520 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor