Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3569 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3569


 AN ACT
 relating to activities conducted in connection with a state or
 federal disease control or eradication program for animals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 161, Agriculture Code, is
 amended by adding Section 161.0417 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.0417.  AUTHORIZED PERSONNEL FOR DISEASE CONTROL.
 (a) A person, including a veterinarian, must be authorized by the
 commission in order to engage in an activity that is part of a state
 or federal disease control or eradication program for animals.
 (b)  The commission shall adopt rules for the authorization
 of a person described by Subsection (a).
 (c)  The commission may, after reasonable notice, suspend or
 revoke a person's authorization under Subsection (a) if the
 commission determines that the person has substantially failed to
 comply with this chapter or rules adopted under this chapter.
 (d)  A person is entitled to a hearing before the commission
 or a hearing examiner appointed by the commission before the
 commission may revoke the person's authorization under Subsection
 (a). The commission shall make all final decisions to suspend or
 revoke an authorization.
 (e)  This section does not affect the requirement for a
 license or an exemption under Chapter 801, Occupations Code, to
 practice veterinary medicine.
 SECTION 2.  Section 161.0601(a), Agriculture Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission by rule may provide for the issuance,
 including electronically, of a certificate of veterinary
 inspection by a veterinarian to a person transporting livestock,
 exotic livestock, domestic fowl, or exotic fowl.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2013, the Texas Animal
 Health Commission shall adopt rules as required by Section
 161.0417, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3569 was passed by the House on May 9,
 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 5, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3569 on May 24, 2013, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3569 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3569 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3569 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor