Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3715 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 15, 2013      TO: Honorable Jim Pitts, Chair, House Committee on Appropriations      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3715 by Guerra (Relating to identification and implementation of hospital funding solutions related to the Medicaid program.), As Introduced    The fiscal implications of the bill are not anticipated to be significant for the 2014-15 biennium. To the extent that the study's proposals are implemented, there would be an indeterminate cost.  The bill would add amend Chapter 531 of the Government Code, to direct the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), in consultation with the Department of State Health Services (DSHS), to conduct a study to identify and implement hospital funding solutions related to the effects of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) Medicaid program. The study findings would be due to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and the Legislature no later than December 1, 2014. To the extent authorized by law, HHSC may implement the proposals identified in the study. It is assumed that the cost of doing the study can be absorbed within current HHSC and DSHS resources. Until the study is complete, the fiscal impact of any implementation of the proposals identified in the study is indeterminable. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote in each house; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2013. Provisions of the bill to study, propose, and implement hospital funding solutions expire September 1, 2015. Local Government Impact The fiscal implications of the bill cannot be determined at this time.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, KK, MB, JTe, NB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 15, 2013





  TO: Honorable Jim Pitts, Chair, House Committee on Appropriations      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3715 by Guerra (Relating to identification and implementation of hospital funding solutions related to the Medicaid program.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Jim Pitts, Chair, House Committee on Appropriations
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3715 by Guerra (Relating to identification and implementation of hospital funding solutions related to the Medicaid program.), As Introduced

 Honorable Jim Pitts, Chair, House Committee on Appropriations 

 Honorable Jim Pitts, Chair, House Committee on Appropriations 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3715 by Guerra (Relating to identification and implementation of hospital funding solutions related to the Medicaid program.), As Introduced

HB3715 by Guerra (Relating to identification and implementation of hospital funding solutions related to the Medicaid program.), As Introduced



The fiscal implications of the bill are not anticipated to be significant for the 2014-15 biennium. To the extent that the study's proposals are implemented, there would be an indeterminate cost.

The fiscal implications of the bill are not anticipated to be significant for the 2014-15 biennium. To the extent that the study's proposals are implemented, there would be an indeterminate cost.



The bill would add amend Chapter 531 of the Government Code, to direct the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), in consultation with the Department of State Health Services (DSHS), to conduct a study to identify and implement hospital funding solutions related to the effects of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) Medicaid program. The study findings would be due to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and the Legislature no later than December 1, 2014. To the extent authorized by law, HHSC may implement the proposals identified in the study. It is assumed that the cost of doing the study can be absorbed within current HHSC and DSHS resources. Until the study is complete, the fiscal impact of any implementation of the proposals identified in the study is indeterminable. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote in each house; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2013. Provisions of the bill to study, propose, and implement hospital funding solutions expire September 1, 2015.

The bill would add amend Chapter 531 of the Government Code, to direct the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), in consultation with the Department of State Health Services (DSHS), to conduct a study to identify and implement hospital funding solutions related to the effects of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) Medicaid program. The study findings would be due to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and the Legislature no later than December 1, 2014. To the extent authorized by law, HHSC may implement the proposals identified in the study. It is assumed that the cost of doing the study can be absorbed within current HHSC and DSHS resources. Until the study is complete, the fiscal impact of any implementation of the proposals identified in the study is indeterminable. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote in each house; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2013. Provisions of the bill to study, propose, and implement hospital funding solutions expire September 1, 2015.

Local Government Impact

The fiscal implications of the bill cannot be determined at this time.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, KK, MB, JTe, NB

 UP, KK, MB, JTe, NB