Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3761 Engrossed / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   H.B. 3761     83R23025 BEF-F   By: Guerra; Muoz, Jr. (Hinojosa)         Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security         5/7/2013         Engrossed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center H.B. 3761
83R23025 BEF-F By: Guerra; Muoz, Jr. (Hinojosa)
 Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
 5/7/2013
 Engrossed

Senate Research Center

H.B. 3761

83R23025 BEF-F

By: Guerra; Muoz, Jr. (Hinojosa)

 

Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security

 

5/7/2013

 

Engrossed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   H.B. 3761 amends current law relating to a feasibility report on the creation of a border agricultural inspection training program.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, by adding Section 12.049, as follows:   Sec. 12.049. FEASIBILITY REPORT ON BORDER AGRICULTURAL INSPECTION TRAINING PROGRAM. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Agriculture (TDA) to consider the feasibility of creating and administering a program to:   (1) train TDA employees to meet federal standards for agricultural inspectors performing inspections, other than inspections of animals as defined by Section 161.001 (Definitions), at ports of entry along the border with the United Mexican States; and   (2) allow TDA employees trained as provided by Subdivision (1) to assist the United States Customs and Border Protection and the United States Department of Agriculture with agricultural inspections, other than inspections of animals as defined by Section 161.001, at ports of entry along the border with the United Mexican States with the goal of reducing the wait time for an agricultural inspection of a vehicle.   (b) Requires TDA to determine whether any agreements with the federal government are required to implement a program described by Subsection (a) and the nature of those agreements.   (c) Requires TDA, not later than December 31, 2014, to submit a report to the committees of each house of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over agriculture concerning the feasibility of a program described by Subsection (a) and the nature of any agreements with the federal government required to implement the program.   (d) Provides that this section expires August 31, 2015.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2013.      

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

H.B. 3761 amends current law relating to a feasibility report on the creation of a border agricultural inspection training program.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, by adding Section 12.049, as follows:

 

Sec. 12.049. FEASIBILITY REPORT ON BORDER AGRICULTURAL INSPECTION TRAINING PROGRAM. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Agriculture (TDA) to consider the feasibility of creating and administering a program to:

 

(1) train TDA employees to meet federal standards for agricultural inspectors performing inspections, other than inspections of animals as defined by Section 161.001 (Definitions), at ports of entry along the border with the United Mexican States; and

 

(2) allow TDA employees trained as provided by Subdivision (1) to assist the United States Customs and Border Protection and the United States Department of Agriculture with agricultural inspections, other than inspections of animals as defined by Section 161.001, at ports of entry along the border with the United Mexican States with the goal of reducing the wait time for an agricultural inspection of a vehicle.

 

(b) Requires TDA to determine whether any agreements with the federal government are required to implement a program described by Subsection (a) and the nature of those agreements.

 

(c) Requires TDA, not later than December 31, 2014, to submit a report to the committees of each house of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over agriculture concerning the feasibility of a program described by Subsection (a) and the nature of any agreements with the federal government required to implement the program.

 

(d) Provides that this section expires August 31, 2015.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2013.