Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3800 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3800
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recording and indexing of property owners'
 association management certificates in the county real property
 records.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 209.004, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The county clerk of each county in which a management
 certificate is filed as required by this section shall record the
 management certificate in the real property records of the county
 and index the document as a "Property Owners' Association
 Management Certificate."
 SECTION 2.  To ensure that all management certificates are
 recorded and indexed in accordance with Section 209.004(a-1),
 Property Code, as added by this Act, on or after September 1, 2013,
 and not later than January 1, 2014, each property owners'
 association that is subject to Section 209.004, Property Code,
 immediately before September 1, 2013, shall file the association's
 management certificate under that section, regardless of whether
 the association filed a management certificate before September 1,
 2013. This section does not affect the time in which a property
 owners' association is required to file the association's
 management certificate under Section 209.004, Property Code, as
 amended by this Act, if the association's initial duty to file the
 management certificate arises on or after September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *