Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3813 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Howard (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 3813
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 8, 2013, rereferred to Committee
 on Natural Resources; May 16, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3813 By:  Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal fire suppression standards in certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 342, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter Z to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER Z. MISCELLANEOUS PROVISIONS
 Sec. 342.901.  FIRE SUPPRESSION STANDARDS IN CERTAIN
 MUNICIPALITIES. (a) This section applies to a general law
 municipality that:
 (1)  has a population of less than 4,000;
 (2)  is located in a county that:
 (A)  has a population of more than one
 million; and
 (B)  is adjacent to a county with a population of
 more than 420,000; and
 (3)  is served by a district governed by Chapter 51,
 Water Code.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the governing body of a
 municipality may by ordinance establish water flow and water
 pressure standards sufficient to provide adequate pressure to fire
 suppression systems and require a district described by Subsection
 (a)(3) that provides water service in the municipality to take
 reasonable measures to comply with those standards.
 (c)  Before a municipality adopts an ordinance under this
 section, the municipality shall, in consultation with the district
 described by Subsection (a)(3) that is subject to the proposed
 ordinance, estimate the costs associated with the proposed
 ordinance.
 (d)  A district described by Subsection (a)(3) may recover
 the costs associated with complying with an ordinance adopted under
 this section through a surcharge assessed only to customers served
 in the municipality to the extent that:
 (1)  complying with the ordinance results in additional
 costs for the district; and
 (2)  the ordinance establishes water flow and water
 pressure standards inside municipal boundaries that are different
 than water flow and water pressure standards required outside
 municipal boundaries.
 (e)  To the extent of a conflict between this section and any
 other law, this section controls.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *