Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3861 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 15, 2013      TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3861 by Lucio III (Relating to the creation of a statutory probate court in Cameron County.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3861, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 15, 2013





  TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3861 by Lucio III (Relating to the creation of a statutory probate court in Cameron County.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3861 by Lucio III (Relating to the creation of a statutory probate court in Cameron County.), As Introduced

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3861 by Lucio III (Relating to the creation of a statutory probate court in Cameron County.), As Introduced

HB3861 by Lucio III (Relating to the creation of a statutory probate court in Cameron County.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3861, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3861, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2015.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0    


2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromJudicial Fund573  Probable Revenue Gain fromJudicial Fund573    2014 $0 $0   2015 ($26,667) $26,667   2016 ($40,000) $40,000   2017 ($40,000) $40,000   2018 ($40,000) $40,000   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromJudicial Fund573  Probable Revenue Gain fromJudicial Fund573    2014 $0 $0   2015 ($26,667) $26,667   2016 ($40,000) $40,000   2017 ($40,000) $40,000   2018 ($40,000) $40,000  


2014 $0 $0
2015 ($26,667) $26,667
2016 ($40,000) $40,000
2017 ($40,000) $40,000
2018 ($40,000) $40,000

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Government Code to create a new statutory probate court in Cameron County. The court would be created January 1, 2015. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013.

Methodology

For a county statutory probate courts, the annual recurring cost to the state would be $40,000 from Judicial Fund No. 573. Local governments pay the other operating costs associated with a statutory probate court. The salary supplement program for statutory probate court judges is funded from fees and court costs collected by county courts statewide and deposited into Judicial Fund No. 573. This estimate assumes that the Statutory Probate Court No. 1 of Cameron County would generate sufficient revenue to Judicial Fund No. 573 to cover costs of the salary supplement. This estimate prorates the fiscal year 2015 cost for the probate court due to the court creation date of January 1, 2015.

Local Government Impact

The Comptroller of Public Accounts reported that Cameron County anticipates start-up construction costs of approximately $1.5 million in fiscal year 2014 and a one-time technology cost of $150,000 in fiscal year 2014. Cameron County would incur personnel costs of $581,746 per year for fiscal years 2016 to 2018. Personnel costs would be pro-rated for nine months in fiscal 2015.

The Comptroller of Public Accounts reported that Cameron County anticipates start-up construction costs of approximately $1.5 million in fiscal year 2014 and a one-time technology cost of $150,000 in fiscal year 2014.

Cameron County would incur personnel costs of $581,746 per year for fiscal years 2016 to 2018. Personnel costs would be pro-rated for nine months in fiscal 2015.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: UP, CL, ZS, JP, KKR

 UP, CL, ZS, JP, KKR