Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB402 Engrossed / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   H.B. 402     83R11534 MCK-D   By: Davis, Sarah (Birdwell)         Veteran Affairs & Military Installations         5/2/2013         Engrossed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center H.B. 402
83R11534 MCK-D By: Davis, Sarah (Birdwell)
 Veteran Affairs & Military Installations
 5/2/2013
 Engrossed

Senate Research Center

H.B. 402

83R11534 MCK-D

By: Davis, Sarah (Birdwell)

 

Veteran Affairs & Military Installations

 

5/2/2013

 

Engrossed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The Cold War, which lasted from September 2, 1945, to December 26, 1991, ended in peace without escalating to the point of global nuclear war. Those who served in the armed services during this turbulent era need to be recognized for their extraordinary achievements. H.B. 402 seeks to acknowledge the efforts made in this war by offering a token equal to that shown by the state to those who served in other international conflicts.   H.B. 402 amends the Government Code to require the Adjutant General's Department to adopt rules and regulate the Texas Cold War Medal. The Adjutant General's Department is directed to collect a fee which is intended to cover the cost of awarding the medal.   H.B. 402 amends current law relating to a medal for certain members of the state military forces who served during the Cold War and authorizes a fee.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the adjutant general in SECTION 1 (Section 431.134, Government Code) of this bill.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 431.134, Government Code, by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c), as follows:   (a) Authorizes the adjutant general to adopt rules and regulations relating to the:   (1)-(14) Makes no change to these subdivisions; and   (15) Cold War Medal, which is required to be awarded to a member of the Texas National Guard or the Texas State Guard who served between September 2, 1945, and December 26, 1991, subject to Subsection (c).   (c) Authorizes a person described by Subsection (a)(15) to be awarded a Cold War Medal only if a fee in the amount necessary to cover the costs of awarding the medal is paid to the adjutant general's department.   SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2013.   

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The Cold War, which lasted from September 2, 1945, to December 26, 1991, ended in peace without escalating to the point of global nuclear war. Those who served in the armed services during this turbulent era need to be recognized for their extraordinary achievements. H.B. 402 seeks to acknowledge the efforts made in this war by offering a token equal to that shown by the state to those who served in other international conflicts.

 

H.B. 402 amends the Government Code to require the Adjutant General's Department to adopt rules and regulate the Texas Cold War Medal. The Adjutant General's Department is directed to collect a fee which is intended to cover the cost of awarding the medal.

 

H.B. 402 amends current law relating to a medal for certain members of the state military forces who served during the Cold War and authorizes a fee.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the adjutant general in SECTION 1 (Section 431.134, Government Code) of this bill.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 431.134, Government Code, by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c), as follows:

 

(a) Authorizes the adjutant general to adopt rules and regulations relating to the:

 

(1)-(14) Makes no change to these subdivisions; and

 

(15) Cold War Medal, which is required to be awarded to a member of the Texas National Guard or the Texas State Guard who served between September 2, 1945, and December 26, 1991, subject to Subsection (c).

 

(c) Authorizes a person described by Subsection (a)(15) to be awarded a Cold War Medal only if a fee in the amount necessary to cover the costs of awarding the medal is paid to the adjutant general's department.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2013.