Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB429 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 429


 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of rural area for purposes of certain
 housing assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing
 and Community Affairs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.004(28-a), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (28-a)  "Rural area" means an area that is located:
 (A)  outside the boundaries of a primary
 metropolitan statistical area or a metropolitan statistical area;
 or
 (B)  within the boundaries of a primary
 metropolitan statistical area or a metropolitan statistical area,
 if the statistical area has a population of 25,000 or less and does
 not share a boundary with an urban area[; or
 [(C)   in an area that is eligible for funding by
 the Texas Rural Development Office of the United States Department
 of Agriculture, other than an area that is located in a municipality
 with a population of more than 50,000].
 SECTION 2.  Section 2306.111, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d-4) to read as follows:
 (d-4)  A proposed or existing development that, before
 September 1, 2013, has been awarded or has received federal
 financial assistance provided under Section 514, 515, or 516 of the
 Housing Act of 1949 (42 U.S.C. Section 1484, 1485, or 1486) may
 apply for low income housing tax credits allocated under Subsection
 (d-2) or (d-3) for the uniform state service region in which the
 development is located regardless of whether the development is
 located in a rural area.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2306.6702(12), Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act in amending
 Section 2306.004(28-a), Government Code, applies only to an
 application for financial assistance that is submitted by a housing
 development to the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs on or after September 1, 2013.  An application for financial
 assistance that is submitted by a housing development to the
 department before September 1, 2013, is governed by the law in
 effect when the application was submitted, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 429 was passed by the House on April
 25, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 131, Nays 5, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 429 on May 20, 2013, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 429 on May 24, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 3, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 429 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 15, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays
 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 429 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 26, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor