H.B. No. 429 AN ACT relating to the definition of rural area for purposes of certain housing assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 2306.004(28-a), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (28-a) "Rural area" means an area that is located: (A) outside the boundaries of a primary metropolitan statistical area or a metropolitan statistical area; or (B) within the boundaries of a primary metropolitan statistical area or a metropolitan statistical area, if the statistical area has a population of 25,000 or less and does not share a boundary with an urban area[; or [(C) in an area that is eligible for funding by the Texas Rural Development Office of the United States Department of Agriculture, other than an area that is located in a municipality with a population of more than 50,000]. SECTION 2. Section 2306.111, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (d-4) to read as follows: (d-4) A proposed or existing development that, before September 1, 2013, has been awarded or has received federal financial assistance provided under Section 514, 515, or 516 of the Housing Act of 1949 (42 U.S.C. Section 1484, 1485, or 1486) may apply for low income housing tax credits allocated under Subsection (d-2) or (d-3) for the uniform state service region in which the development is located regardless of whether the development is located in a rural area. SECTION 3. Section 2306.6702(12), Government Code, is repealed. SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act in amending Section 2306.004(28-a), Government Code, applies only to an application for financial assistance that is submitted by a housing development to the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs on or after September 1, 2013. An application for financial assistance that is submitted by a housing development to the department before September 1, 2013, is governed by the law in effect when the application was submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 429 was passed by the House on April 25, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 5, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 429 on May 20, 2013, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 429 on May 24, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 3, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 429 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 15, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 429 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 4. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor