Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB462 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huberty, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 462
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 17, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 462 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to state control of teacher appraisal criteria, curriculum
 standards, and assessment instruments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), (b-3), and (b-4) to read as
 follows:
 (b-1)  In this section, "common core state standards" means
 the national curriculum standards developed by the Common Core
 State Standards Initiative.
 (b-2)  The State Board of Education may not adopt common core
 state standards to comply with a duty imposed under this chapter.
 (b-3)  A school district may not use common core state
 standards to comply with the requirement to provide instruction in
 the essential knowledge and skills at appropriate grade levels
 under Subsection (c).
 (b-4)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, a
 school district or open-enrollment charter school may not be
 required to offer any aspect of a common core state standards
 curriculum.
 SECTION 3.  Section 39.023, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-3) to read as follows:
 (a-3)  The agency may not adopt or develop a
 criterion-referenced assessment instrument under this section
 based on common core state standards as defined by Section
 28.002(b-1).  This subsection does not prohibit the use of college
 advanced placement tests or international baccalaureate
 examinations as those terms are defined by Section 28.051.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *