Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB500 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hilderbran, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 500
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0, 1 present not
 voting; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 500 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the $1 million total revenue exemption for the
 franchise tax; temporarily decreasing the rates of the franchise
 tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 171, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 171.0022 to read as follows:
 Sec. 171.0022.  TEMPORARY PERMISSIVE ALTERNATE RATES. (a)
 Notwithstanding Section 171.002(a) and subject to Section 171.1016
 and Subsection (b) of this section, a taxable entity may elect to
 pay the tax imposed under this chapter at a rate of 0.95 percent of
 taxable margin.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 171.002(b) and subject to
 Section 171.1016, a taxable entity primarily engaged in retail or
 wholesale trade as defined by Sections 171.002(c) and (c-1) may
 elect to pay the tax imposed under this chapter at a rate of 0.475
 percent of taxable margin.
 (c)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2014, and before January 1, 2016.
 (d)  This section expires December 31, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Section 1(c), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts
 of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by
 Section 37.01, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st
 Called Session, 2011, is repealed.
 (b)  This section takes effect September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Section 2, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
 37.02, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (d), Section
 171.002, Tax Code, is repealed.
 (b)  This section takes effect September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  Section 3, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
 37.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (a), Section
 171.0021, Tax Code, is repealed.
 (b)  This section takes effect September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 5.  Section 171.006(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  Beginning in 2010, on January 1 of each even-numbered
 year, the amounts prescribed by Sections 171.002(d)(2)[,
 171.0021,] and 171.1013(c) are increased or decreased by an amount
 equal to the amount prescribed by those sections on December 31 of
 the preceding year multiplied by the percentage increase or
 decrease during the preceding state fiscal biennium in the consumer
 price index and rounded to the nearest $10,000.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 171.0021 and 171.1016(d), Tax Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 7.  This Act applies only to a report originally due
 on or after January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 8.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *