Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB568 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R1988 KJM-D
 By: White H.B. No. 568


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a select committee to evaluate the
 effects of reduction in or elimination of federal funding on the
 state budget due to federal fiscal policy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 10, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 2116 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 2116. SELECT COMMITTEE ON BUDGET DEPENDENCE ON FEDERAL
 FUNDING
 Sec. 2116.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "committee"
 means the Select Committee on Budget Dependence on Federal Funding.
 Sec. 2116.002.  COMPOSITION. (a) The committee is composed
 of:
 (1)  four members of the senate, including members from
 different political parties, appointed by the lieutenant governor
 based on seniority;
 (2)  four members of the house of representatives,
 including members from different political parties, appointed by
 the speaker of the house of representatives based on seniority;
 (3)  a representative of a nonprofit or charitable
 organization appointed by the governor;
 (4)  a representative of an advocacy organization
 focused on state and federal fiscal matters appointed by the
 governor;
 (5)  a representative of the Legislative Budget Board
 appointed by the Legislative Budget Board; and
 (6)  a representative of the comptroller's office,
 appointed by the comptroller.
 (b)  The committee shall elect a presiding officer from among
 its members.
 Sec. 2116.003.  COMPENSATION. A committee member serves
 without compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for actual
 and necessary expenses incurred in performing functions as a
 committee member, subject to any applicable limitation on
 reimbursement provided by general law or the General Appropriations
 Act.
 Sec. 2116.004.  COMMITTEE DUTIES. The committee shall:
 (1)  meet at the call of the presiding officer;
 (2)  conduct a study on:
 (A)  the percentage of the state budget that is
 funded by federal money; and
 (B)  the effects on the state budget if federal
 fiscal policy necessitates a significant reduction in or
 elimination of federal funding for state governments; and
 (3)  create a plan to address the loss of federal money,
 including federal Medicaid matching money and federal social
 security payments, and maintain benefit programs and other
 essential state services if federal fiscal policy necessitates a
 significant reduction in or elimination of federal funding for
 state governments.
 Sec. 2116.005.  REPORT.  Not later than September 1, 2014,
 the committee shall submit a report based on its findings to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor; and
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives.
 Sec. 2116.006.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires and the
 committee is abolished December 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than October 1, 2013, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 the governor, the comptroller of public accounts, and the
 Legislative Budget Board shall make the appointments and
 designations required by Section 2116.002(a), Government Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than November 1, 2013, the governor shall call
 the first meeting of the Select Committee on Budget Dependence on
 Federal Funding to permit the committee to elect a presiding
 officer as required by Section 2116.002(b), Government Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.