Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB595 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Kolkhorst (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 595
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 17, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 595 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain health programs and councils.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 533.005(a-1), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The requirements imposed by Subsections (a)(23)(A),
 (B), and (C) do not apply, and may not be enforced, on and after
 August 31, 2018 [2013].
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Chapters 38, 46, 83, 90, and 91, Health and
 Safety Code, are repealed.
 (b)  Subchapters A and C, Chapter 86, Health and Safety Code,
 are repealed.
 (c)  Sections 86.011 and 86.012, Health and Safety Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  On September 1, 2013, the programs and
 system established under Chapters 38, 46, 83, 86, 90, and 91, Health
 and Safety Code, as the laws existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, are abolished.
 (b)  On September 1, 2013, any money remaining in the
 tertiary care account is transferred to the general revenue fund
 and the account is abolished.
 (c)  The repeal of Chapter 83, Health and Safety Code, by
 this Act does not affect a cause of action that accrued before the
 effective date of this Act. A cause of action that accrued before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before that date, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  On September 1, 2013:
 (1)  the advisory council established under Section
 86.003, Health and Safety Code, as the law existed immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, is abolished;
 (2)  all property in the custody of the advisory
 council is transferred to the Department of State Health Services;
 and
 (3)  all contracts, leases, rights, and obligations of
 the advisory council are transferred to the Department of State
 Health Services.
 SECTION 5.  On September 1, 2013:
 (1)  the advisory committee established under Section
 86.012, Health and Safety Code, as the law existed immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, is abolished;
 (2)  all property in the custody of the advisory
 committee is transferred to the Department of State Health
 Services; and
 (3)  all contracts, leases, rights, and obligations of
 the advisory committee are transferred to the Department of State
 Health Services.
 SECTION 6.  On September 1, 2013:
 (1)  the advisory council established under Section
 86.103, Health and Safety Code, as the law existed immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, is abolished;
 (2)  all property in the custody of the advisory
 council is transferred to the Department of State Health Services;
 and
 (3)  all contracts, leases, rights, and obligations of
 the advisory council are transferred to the Department of State
 Health Services.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *