H.B. No. 595 AN ACT relating to certain health programs and councils. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 533.005(a-1), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a-1) The requirements imposed by Subsections (a)(23)(A), (B), and (C) do not apply, and may not be enforced, on and after August 31, 2018 [2013]. SECTION 2. (a) Chapters 38, 46, 83, 90, and 91, Health and Safety Code, are repealed. (b) Subchapters A and C, Chapter 86, Health and Safety Code, are repealed. (c) Sections 86.011 and 86.012, Health and Safety Code, are repealed. SECTION 3. (a) On September 1, 2013, the programs and system established under Chapters 38, 46, 83, 86, 90, and 91, Health and Safety Code, as the laws existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, are abolished. (b) On September 1, 2013, any money remaining in the tertiary care account is transferred to the general revenue fund and the account is abolished. (c) The repeal of Chapter 83, Health and Safety Code, by this Act does not affect a cause of action that accrued before the effective date of this Act. A cause of action that accrued before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. On September 1, 2013: (1) the advisory council established under Section 86.003, Health and Safety Code, as the law existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, is abolished; (2) all property in the custody of the advisory council is transferred to the Department of State Health Services; and (3) all contracts, leases, rights, and obligations of the advisory council are transferred to the Department of State Health Services. SECTION 5. On September 1, 2013: (1) the advisory committee established under Section 86.012, Health and Safety Code, as the law existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, is abolished; (2) all property in the custody of the advisory committee is transferred to the Department of State Health Services; and (3) all contracts, leases, rights, and obligations of the advisory committee are transferred to the Department of State Health Services. SECTION 6. On September 1, 2013: (1) the advisory council established under Section 86.103, Health and Safety Code, as the law existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, is abolished; (2) all property in the custody of the advisory council is transferred to the Department of State Health Services; and (3) all contracts, leases, rights, and obligations of the advisory council are transferred to the Department of State Health Services. SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 595 was passed by the House on May 4, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 595 on May 24, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 595 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor