Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB634 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Farias, Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 634
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the verification of an inmate's veteran status by the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 501.023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.023.  VERIFICATION OF INMATE VETERAN STATUS. (a)
 In this section, "system" means the Public Assistance Reporting
 Information System (PARIS) operated by the Administration for
 Children and Families of the United States Department of Health and
 Human Services.
 (b)  The department shall:
 (1)  investigate and verify the veteran status of each
 inmate by using data made available from the system through the
 Health and Human Services Commission; and
 (2)  use system data to assist inmates who are veterans
 in applying for federal benefits or compensation for which the
 inmates may be eligible under a program administered by the United
 States Department of Veterans Affairs.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *