Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB680 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 680
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2013, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 680 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to provisions in the dedicatory instruments of property
 owners' associations regarding display of flags.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 202.001, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (5) to read as follows:
 (5)  "Front yard" means a yard within a lot having a
 front building setback line with a setback of not less than 20 feet
 extending the full width of the lot between the front lot line and
 the front building setback line.
 SECTION 2.  Section 202.011, Property Code, as added by
 Chapter 1028 (H.B. 2779), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (b)  A property owners' association may adopt or enforce
 reasonable dedicatory instrument provisions:
 (1)  that require:
 (A)  the flag of the United States be displayed in
 accordance with 4 U.S.C. Sections 5-10;
 (B)  the flag of the State of Texas be displayed in
 accordance with Chapter 3100, Government Code;
 (C)  a flagpole attached to a dwelling or a
 freestanding flagpole be constructed of permanent, long-lasting
 materials, with a finish appropriate to the materials used in the
 construction of the flagpole and harmonious with the dwelling;
 (D)  the display of a flag, or the location and
 construction of the supporting flagpole, to comply with applicable
 zoning ordinances, easements, and setbacks of record; and
 (E)  a displayed flag and the flagpole on which it
 is flown be maintained in good condition and that any deteriorated
 flag or deteriorated or structurally unsafe flagpole be repaired,
 replaced, or removed;
 (2)  that regulate the size, number, and location of
 flagpoles on which flags are displayed, except that the regulation
 may not prevent the installation or erection of at least one
 flagpole per property that:
 (A)  is not more than 20 feet in height and,
 subject to applicable zoning ordinances, easements, and setbacks of
 record, is located in the front yard of the property; or
 (B)  is attached to any portion of a residential
 structure owned by the property owner and not maintained by the
 property owners' association;
 (3)  that govern the size of a displayed flag;
 (4)  that regulate the size, location, and intensity of
 any lights used to illuminate a displayed flag;
 (5)  that impose reasonable restrictions to abate noise
 caused by an external halyard of a flagpole; [or]
 (6)  that prohibit a property owner from locating a
 displayed flag or flagpole on property that is:
 (A)  owned or maintained by the property owners'
 association; or
 (B)  owned in common by the members of the
 association; or
 (7)  that prohibit a flagpole that was installed
 without prior approval by the property owners' association or by a
 committee created in a dedicatory instrument for such purposes that
 provides decisions within a reasonable period or within a period
 specified in the dedicatory instrument.
 (c)  A property owner who has a front yard and who otherwise
 complies with any permitted property owners' association
 regulations may elect to install a flagpole in accordance with
 either Subsection (b)(2)(A) or Subsection (b)(2)(B).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *