Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB798 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Harris H.B. No. 798
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 798By:  Watson By:  Watson
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 9, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain actions taken by certain licensing authorities
 regarding a license holder or applicant who has been convicted of a
 Class C misdemeanor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 53.021, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a person who has been
 convicted only of an offense punishable as a Class C misdemeanor
 unless:
 (1)  the person is an applicant for or the holder of a
 license that authorizes the person to possess a firearm; and
 (2)  the offense for which the person was convicted is a
 misdemeanor crime of domestic violence as that term is defined by 18
 U.S.C. Section 921.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to an
 application for, or a disciplinary proceeding regarding, a license
 or other authorization that is pending with a licensing authority
 on the effective date of this Act or an application filed or a
 disciplinary proceeding commenced on or after that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *