Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB880 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 11, 2013      TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee On Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 requiring persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premisesconsumption to maintain a liability insurance policy. The bill also requires the Texas AlcoholicBeverage Commission (TABC) to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2013. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013 and would pertain to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2014, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2014, regardless of when the permit or license was issued. This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within TABC's current resources. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission   LBB Staff:  UP, RB, AI, KNi    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 11, 2013





  TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee On Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee On Licensing & Administrative Procedures
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced

 Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee On Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee On Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced

HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 requiring persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premisesconsumption to maintain a liability insurance policy. The bill also requires the Texas AlcoholicBeverage Commission (TABC) to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2013. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013 and would pertain to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2014, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2014, regardless of when the permit or license was issued. This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within TABC's current resources.

The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 requiring persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premisesconsumption to maintain a liability insurance policy. The bill also requires the Texas AlcoholicBeverage Commission (TABC) to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2013. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013 and would pertain to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2014, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2014, regardless of when the permit or license was issued.

This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within TABC's current resources.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission

458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission

LBB Staff: UP, RB, AI, KNi

 UP, RB, AI, KNi