Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB880 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION   Revision 1         April 19, 2013      TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 to require persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premisesconsumption to maintain a liability insurance policy. The bill would pertain to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2014, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2014, regardless of when the permit or license was issued. Holders of food and beverage certificates are exempted from the provisions of the bill.  The bill would also require the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2013. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013.  This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within existing appropriations. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:454 Department of Insurance, 458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission   LBB Staff:  UP, RB, AI, ER    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
Revision 1
April 19, 2013

Revision 1

Revision 1

  TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB880 by Turner, Chris (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 to require persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premisesconsumption to maintain a liability insurance policy. The bill would pertain to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2014, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2014, regardless of when the permit or license was issued. Holders of food and beverage certificates are exempted from the provisions of the bill.  The bill would also require the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2013. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013.  This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within existing appropriations.

The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 to require persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premisesconsumption to maintain a liability insurance policy. The bill would pertain to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2014, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2014, regardless of when the permit or license was issued. Holders of food and beverage certificates are exempted from the provisions of the bill. 

The bill would also require the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2013. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013. 

This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within existing appropriations.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 454 Department of Insurance, 458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission

454 Department of Insurance, 458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission

LBB Staff: UP, RB, AI, ER

 UP, RB, AI, ER