Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB893 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 893
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; April 24, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 April 24, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 893 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to consumption of alcoholic beverages in certain public
 entertainment facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 108, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, is amended by adding Section 108.82 to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.82.  ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONSUMPTION IN CERTAIN
 PUBLIC ENTERTAINMENT FACILITIES. (a) This section applies only with
 respect to a public entertainment facility:
 (1)  that is a stadium:
 (A)  located in a county with a population of more
 than 1.6 million;
 (B)  constructed not later than 1994; and
 (C)  with a seating capacity of at least 45,000;
 and
 (2)  for which all alcoholic beverage permits and
 licenses are held by a single independent concessionaire.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 28.10, the independent
 concessionaire for a public entertainment facility described by
 Subsection (a) may allow a patron who possesses an alcoholic
 beverage to enter or leave a licensed or permitted premises within
 the facility if the alcoholic beverage:
 (1)  is in an open container, as defined by Section
 49.031, Penal Code;
 (2)  appears to be possessed for present consumption;
 (3)  remains within the confines of the facility,
 excluding a parking lot; and
 (4)  was purchased legally at a licensed or permitted
 premises within the facility.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *