Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB937 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 23, 2013      TO: Honorable Tan Parker, Chair, House Committee on Corrections      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB937 by Farias (Relating to establishing a restorative justice pilot program for juvenile offenders in certain counties.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB937, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($2,659,068) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 23, 2013





  TO: Honorable Tan Parker, Chair, House Committee on Corrections      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB937 by Farias (Relating to establishing a restorative justice pilot program for juvenile offenders in certain counties.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Tan Parker, Chair, House Committee on Corrections
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB937 by Farias (Relating to establishing a restorative justice pilot program for juvenile offenders in certain counties.), As Introduced

 Honorable Tan Parker, Chair, House Committee on Corrections 

 Honorable Tan Parker, Chair, House Committee on Corrections 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB937 by Farias (Relating to establishing a restorative justice pilot program for juvenile offenders in certain counties.), As Introduced

HB937 by Farias (Relating to establishing a restorative justice pilot program for juvenile offenders in certain counties.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB937, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($2,659,068) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB937, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($2,659,068) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2014 ($1,329,534)   2015 ($1,329,534)   2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0    


2014 ($1,329,534)
2015 ($1,329,534)
2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2014 ($1,329,534)   2015 ($1,329,534)   2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2014 ($1,329,534)   2015 ($1,329,534)   2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0  


2014 ($1,329,534)
2015 ($1,329,534)
2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would create Chapter 62 in the Family Code, which would create a restorative juvenile justice pilot program in the largest urban counties in the State. The bill would require that the counties involved submit a report to the Texas Juvenile Justice Department (TJJD) regarding the effectiveness of the pilot program by December 1, 2014. The bill also specifies that TJJD must provide sufficient funds to the counties for the establishment of the pilot program in eligible counties if funds are appropriated for the purposes of Chapter 62. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013 and expire on September 2, 2015.

Methodology

The agency has identified Bexar, Dallas, and Harris counties as eligible for the pilot program under the eligibility requirements of the bill. The agency also estimates that each eligible county would require seven full-time equivalents for the establishment and operation of the pilot program. The agency estimates the salaries of the seven full-time equivalents to total $435,490 per fiscal year, and an additional $7,688 for non-salary expenses per fiscal year. This analysis assumes that the same costs would apply to the program in all eligible counties, for a total of $443,178 per fiscal year per county.

The agency has identified Bexar, Dallas, and Harris counties as eligible for the pilot program under the eligibility requirements of the bill. The agency also estimates that each eligible county would require seven full-time equivalents for the establishment and operation of the pilot program. The agency estimates the salaries of the seven full-time equivalents to total $435,490 per fiscal year, and an additional $7,688 for non-salary expenses per fiscal year. This analysis assumes that the same costs would apply to the program in all eligible counties, for a total of $443,178 per fiscal year per county.

Technology

The bill would not have an effect on the technology resources of the state.

Local Government Impact

Because the bill would not have statewide impact on units of local government of the same type or class, no comment from this office is required by the rules of the House/Senate as to its probable fiscal implication on units of local government.

Source Agencies: 644 Texas Juvenile Justice Department, 665 Juvenile Probation Commission

644 Texas Juvenile Justice Department, 665 Juvenile Probation Commission

LBB Staff: UP, ESi, AI, KNi, JPo, KKR, GG, JGA

 UP, ESi, AI, KNi, JPo, KKR, GG, JGA