Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1057 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 1057
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 March 28, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 28, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1057 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information about private health care insurance
 coverage and the health insurance exchange for individuals applying
 for certain Department of State Health Services health or mental
 health benefits, services, and assistance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 1001.080 and 1001.081 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1001.080.  HEALTH INSURANCE COVERAGE INFORMATION.
 (a)  In this section, "individual's legally authorized
 representative" means:
 (1)  a parent, managing conservator, or guardian of an
 individual, if the individual is a minor;
 (2)  a guardian of an individual, if the individual has
 been adjudicated incompetent to manage the individual's personal
 affairs; or
 (3)  an agent of the individual authorized under a
 durable power of attorney for health care.
 (b)  This section applies to health or mental health
 benefits, services, or assistance provided by the department that
 the department anticipates will be impacted by a health insurance
 exchange as defined by Section 1001.081(a), including:
 (1)  community primary health care services provided
 under Chapter 31;
 (2)  women's and children's health services provided
 under Chapter 32;
 (3)  services for children with special health care
 needs provided under Chapter 35;
 (4)  epilepsy program assistance provided under
 Chapter 40;
 (5)  hemophilia program assistance provided under
 Chapter 41;
 (6)  kidney health care services provided under Chapter
 42;
 (7)  human immunodeficiency virus infection and
 sexually transmitted disease prevention programs and services
 provided under Chapter 85;
 (8)  immunization programs provided under Chapter 161;
 (9)  programs and services provided by the Rio Grande
 State Center under Chapter 252;
 (10)  mental health services for adults provided under
 Chapter 534;
 (11)  mental health services for children provided
 under Chapter 534;
 (12)  the NorthSTAR Behavioral Health Program provided
 under Chapter 534;
 (13)  programs and services provided by community
 mental health hospitals under Chapter 552;
 (14)  programs and services provided by state mental
 health hospitals under Chapter 552; and
 (15)  any other health or mental health program or
 service designated by the department.
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (d), the department may not
 provide health or mental health benefits, services, or assistance
 described in Subsection (b) unless the individual applying to
 receive the benefits, services, or assistance submits to the
 department on the form prescribed by the department:
 (1)  a statement by the individual or the individual's
 legally authorized representative attesting that the individual
 does not have access to private health care insurance that provides
 coverage for the benefit, service, or assistance; or
 (2)  if the individual has access to private health
 care insurance that provides coverage for the benefit, service, or
 assistance, the information and authorization necessary for the
 department to submit a claim for reimbursement from the insurer for
 the benefit, service, or assistance.
 (d)  The department may waive the prohibition under
 Subsection (c) for an individual or for health or mental health
 benefits, services, or assistance described in Subsection (b) if
 the department determines that a benefit, service, or assistance is
 necessary during a crisis or emergency.
 (e)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement this section.
 Sec. 1001.081.  HEALTH INSURANCE EXCHANGE INFORMATION.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Health insurance exchange" means an American
 Health Benefit Exchange administered by the federal government
 under 42 U.S.C. Section 18041 or created under 42 U.S.C. Section
 18031.
 (2)  "Individual's legally authorized representative"
 has the meaning assigned by Section 1001.080(a).
 (b)  The department may develop informational materials
 regarding health care insurance coverage and subsidies available
 under a health insurance exchange.
 (c)  The department shall provide the informational
 materials regarding health care insurance coverage and subsidies
 available under a health insurance exchange to an individual or the
 individual's legally authorized representative who:
 (1)  applies to receive health or mental health
 benefits, services, or assistance described in Section
 1001.080(b); and
 (2)  has an income above 100 percent of the federal
 poverty level.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Department of State Health Services shall
 prescribe the form required by Section 1001.080, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as possible after the effective date of
 this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission shall apply for
 any waiver or other authorization necessary to implement this Act.
 The commission may delay implementing this Act until the waiver or
 authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *