S.B. No. 1060 AN ACT relating to family cost share provisions in the early childhood intervention program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 117, Human Resources Code, is amended by adding Sections 117.077 and 117.078 to read as follows: Sec. 117.077. DATA ANALYSIS IN FAMILY COST SHARE PROVISIONS IN EARLY CHILDHOOD INTERVENTION PROGRAM. (a) In this section, "cost-effective" means the family cost share revenue generated is greater than total administrative costs. (b) The department shall collect data, including data on administrative costs and adjusted family income, sufficient to evaluate: (1) the cost-effectiveness of the family cost share provisions of the early childhood intervention program; and (2) changes necessary to improve the cost-effectiveness of the program. (c) The department shall: (1) as necessary, modify the Texas Kids Intervention Data System to accept adjusted family income data submitted by early childhood intervention program providers; and (2) require all providers to enter adjusted family income data into the system. (d) The department shall use the data collected under this section to evaluate the cost-effectiveness of existing family cost share provisions in the early childhood intervention program and consider changes that may improve the cost-effectiveness of the program, including the adoption of a family cost share provision described by Section 117.078(a). (e) The department shall implement any changes considered under Subsection (d) that the department determines will make the family cost share provisions of the early childhood intervention program more cost-effective, if the changes will not make access to early childhood intervention services cost prohibitive for families. If none of the considered changes is determined to make the program more cost-effective, or if the department determines that the changes will make access to early childhood intervention services cost prohibitive for families, the department may decline to implement the changes. (f) The department shall evaluate existing family cost share provisions and consider and implement changes, if appropriate, to the early childhood intervention program as required by this section: (1) on a periodic basis established by the department; and (2) at other times at the request of the Legislative Budget Board. (g) Not later than December 1, 2014, the department shall: (1) conduct the initial evaluation required under Subsection (d) and implement any changes as required by Subsection (e) resulting from that evaluation; and (2) submit a report to the governor and the Legislative Budget Board summarizing the results of the initial evaluation and explaining any changes that were implemented. (h) This subsection and Subsection (g) expire September 1, 2015. Sec. 117.078. FAMILY COST SHARE PROVISION IN EARLY CHILDHOOD INTERVENTION PROGRAM. (a) The department shall consider implementing a family cost share provision under which the amount a family pays to participate in the early childhood intervention program is based on the amount of service the family receives under the program. (b) A family cost share provision implemented by the department under Subsection (a) must establish a maximum amount to be paid by a family participating in the early childhood intervention program that is based on the family's size and adjusted gross income, with families in higher income brackets required to pay more under the provision than those families paid before the provision's implementation. SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the waiver or authorization is granted. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1060 passed the Senate on March 27, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1060 passed the House on May 14, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor