Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1082 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez, Deuell S.B. No. 1082
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 March 28, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; March 28, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1082 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to examination requirements for certain applicants for a
 license to practice medicine.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 155.051, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  The time frame to pass each part of the examination does
 not apply to an applicant who:
 (1)  is licensed and in good standing as a physician in
 another state;
 (2)  has been licensed for at least five years;
 (3)  does not hold a medical license in the other state
 that has or has ever had any restrictions, disciplinary orders, or
 probation; and
 (4)  will practice in a medically underserved area or a
 health manpower shortage area, as those terms are defined by
 Section 157.052.
 (e)  The board may by rule establish a process to verify that
 a person, after meeting the requirements of Subsection (d),
 practices only in an area described by Subsection (d)(4).
 SECTION 2.  Section 155.056, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (d) and adding Subsection (e) to read
 as follows:
 (a)  An applicant must pass:
 (1)  each individual part of an examination within five
 [three] attempts; and
 (2)  all parts of an examination collectively within
 nine attempts.
 (d)  The limitation on examination attempts by an applicant
 under Subsection (a) does not apply to:
 (1)  an applicant who[:
 [(1)     is licensed and in good standing as a physician in
 another state;
 [(2)  has been licensed for at least five years;
 [(3)     does not hold a medical license in the other state
 that has any restrictions, disciplinary orders, or probation; and
 [(4)     passed all but one part of the examination
 approved by the board within three attempts and:
 [(A)     passed the remaining part of the examination
 within one additional attempt; or
 [(B)     passed the remaining part of the examination
 within six attempts if the applicant:
 [(i)]  is specialty board certified by a
 specialty board that:
 (A) [(a)]  is a member of the American Board of
 Medical Specialties; or
 (B) [(b)]  is approved by the American
 Osteopathic Association; or
 (2)  an applicant who:
 (A)  is licensed and in good standing as a
 physician in another state;
 (B)  has been licensed for at least five years;
 (C)  does not hold a medical license in the other
 state that has or has ever had any restrictions, disciplinary
 orders, or probation; and
 (D)  will practice in a medically underserved area
 or a health manpower shortage area, as those terms are defined by
 Section 157.052[; and
 [(ii)     has completed in this state an
 additional two years of postgraduate medical training approved by
 the board].
 (e)  The board may by rule establish a process to verify that
 a person who, after meeting the requirements of Subsection (d)(2),
 practices only in an area described by Subsection (d)(2)(D).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *