Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB110 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 16, 2013      TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB110 by West (Relating to eligibility for compensation of persons wrongfully imprisoned.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Civil Practice and Remedies Code relating to eligibility for compensation by persons wrongfully imprisoned. Under the provisions of the bill, a person seeking compensation who received a pardon or was granted relief before September 1, 1998, and who has not previously received compensation under law, may file for compensation not later than September 1, 2016. The bill would provide that a person would not be entitled to compensation for any part of a sentence in prison during which the person was also serving a concurrent sentence for another wrongful conviction and had already received compensation. It is anticipated the bill's provisions would not have a significant fiscal impact on the State. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, AI, JN, KKR, AG    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 16, 2013





  TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB110 by West (Relating to eligibility for compensation of persons wrongfully imprisoned.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB110 by West (Relating to eligibility for compensation of persons wrongfully imprisoned.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB110 by West (Relating to eligibility for compensation of persons wrongfully imprisoned.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted

SB110 by West (Relating to eligibility for compensation of persons wrongfully imprisoned.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Civil Practice and Remedies Code relating to eligibility for compensation by persons wrongfully imprisoned. Under the provisions of the bill, a person seeking compensation who received a pardon or was granted relief before September 1, 1998, and who has not previously received compensation under law, may file for compensation not later than September 1, 2016. The bill would provide that a person would not be entitled to compensation for any part of a sentence in prison during which the person was also serving a concurrent sentence for another wrongful conviction and had already received compensation. It is anticipated the bill's provisions would not have a significant fiscal impact on the State. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2013.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board

LBB Staff: UP, CL, AI, JN, KKR, AG

 UP, CL, AI, JN, KKR, AG