Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB110 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: West S.B. No. 110
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2012; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 24, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 110 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for compensation of persons wrongfully
 imprisoned.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 103.001, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  A person is not entitled to compensation under
 Subsection (a) or group health benefit plan coverage under
 Subsection (d) for any part of a sentence in prison during which the
 person was also serving a concurrent sentence for another wrongful
 conviction for which the person has already received compensation
 under Subsection (a) or group health plan coverage under Subsection
 (d).
 SECTION 2.  Section 103.003, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 103.003.  LIMITATION ON TIME TO FILE.  (a)  A person
 seeking compensation under this chapter must file an application
 with the comptroller for compensation under Subchapter B not later
 than the third anniversary of the date:
 (1)  the person on whose imprisonment the claim is
 based received a pardon as provided by Section 103.001(a)(2)(A);
 (2)  the person's application for a writ of habeas
 corpus was granted as provided by Section 103.001(a)(2)(B); or
 (3)  an order of dismissal described by Section
 103.001(a)(2)(C) was signed.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a person seeking
 compensation under this chapter who received the pardon or was
 granted relief as described by Subsection (a) before September 1,
 1998, may file an application with the comptroller for compensation
 under Subchapter B not later than September 1, 2016.  This
 subsection expires September 2, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *