Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1147 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: West S.B. No. 1147
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 2, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1147 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the electronic filing system established by rule or
 order of the Texas Supreme Court; authorizing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 72, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 72.031 to read as follows:
 Sec. 72.031.  ELECTRONIC FILING SYSTEM. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Appellate court" means the supreme court, the
 court of criminal appeals, or a court of appeals.
 (2)  "Electronic filing system" means the filing system
 established by supreme court rule or order for the electronic
 filing of documents in courts of this state.
 (3)  "Electronic filing transaction" means the
 simultaneous electronic filing of one or more documents related to
 a proceeding before a court in this state.
 (4)  "Local government" means a county or municipality.
 (b)  The office as authorized by supreme court rule or order
 may implement an electronic filing system for use in the courts of
 this state and may set fees for transactions that use the electronic
 filing system.  A fee set under this subsection for a transaction
 may not exceed $4.
 (c)  A fee set by the office for using the electronic filing
 system is in addition to any other statutory fee.  The revenue
 collected from the fees must be used to support the electronic
 filing system, including the recovery of system costs.
 (d)  A local government or appellate court that uses the
 electronic filing system may charge a fee of $2 for each electronic
 filing transaction if:
 (1)  the fee is necessary to recover the actual system
 operating costs reasonably incurred by the local government or
 appellate court to:
 (A)  accept electronic payment methods; or
 (B)  interface with other technology information
 systems;
 (2)  the fee does not include an amount to recover local
 government or appellate court employee costs, other than costs for
 directly maintaining the system;
 (3)  the governing body of the local government or the
 appellate court approves the fee using the local government or
 appellate court's standard approval process for fee increases; and
 (4)  the local government or appellate court annually
 certifies to the office on a form prescribed by the office that the
 amount of the fee is necessary to recover the actual system
 operating costs incurred by the local government or appellate
 court.
 (d-1)  This subsection and Subsection (d) expire September
 1, 2019.
 (e)  A local government or appellate court that uses the
 electronic filing system may accept electronic payment methods,
 including payments made with credit and debit cards.
 (f)  A governmental entity not otherwise required to pay a
 filing fee under any other law may not be required to pay a fee
 established under this section.
 (g)  A court shall waive payment of any fee due under this
 section for an individual the court determines is indigent.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 33.48, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to other costs authorized by law, a taxing
 unit is entitled to recover the following costs and expenses in a
 suit to collect a delinquent tax:
 (1)  all usual court costs, including the cost of
 serving process and electronic filing fees;
 (2)  costs of filing for record a notice of lis pendens
 against property;
 (3)  expenses of foreclosure sale;
 (4)  reasonable expenses that are incurred by the
 taxing unit in determining the name, identity, and location of
 necessary parties and in procuring necessary legal descriptions of
 the property on which a delinquent tax is due;
 (5)  attorney's fees in the amount of 15 percent of the
 total amount of taxes, penalties, and interest due the unit; and
 (6)  reasonable attorney ad litem fees approved by the
 court that are incurred in a suit in which the court orders the
 appointment of an attorney to represent the interests of a
 defendant served with process by means of citation by publication
 or posting.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 33.49, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), a taxing unit is
 not liable in a suit to collect taxes for court costs, including any
 fees for service of process and electronic filing fees, an attorney
 ad litem, arbitration, or mediation, and may not be required to post
 security for costs.
 SECTION 4.  Section 231.202, Family Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 231.202.  AUTHORIZED COSTS AND FEES IN TITLE IV-D
 CASES. In a Title IV-D case filed under this title, including a
 case filed under Chapter 159, the Title IV-D agency shall pay only
 the following costs and fees:
 (1)  filing fees and fees for issuance and service of
 process as provided by Chapter 110 of this code and by Sections
 51.317(b)(1), (2), and (3) and (b-1), 51.318(b)(2), and 51.319(2),
 Government Code;
 (2)  fees for transfer as provided by Chapter 110;
 (3)  fees for the issuance and delivery of orders and
 writs of income withholding in the amounts provided by Chapter 110;
 (4)  the fee for services provided by sheriffs and
 constables, including:
 (A)  a fee authorized under Section 118.131, Local
 Government Code, for serving each item of process to each
 individual on whom service is required, including service by
 certified or registered mail; and
 (B)  a fee authorized under Section 157.103(b) for
 serving a capias;
 (5)  the fee for filing an administrative writ of
 withholding under Section 158.503(d);
 (6)  the fee for issuance of a subpoena as provided by
 Section 51.318(b)(1), Government Code; and
 (7)  a fee authorized [under a local rule] for the
 electronic filing of documents with a clerk.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than December 1, 2018, the Office of
 Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall file a
 report with the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the presiding officers of the standing
 committees of each house of the legislature with jurisdiction over
 the judiciary detailing the number of local governments and
 appellate courts collecting a fee under Subsection (d), Section
 72.031, Government Code, as added by this Act, and the necessity of
 the local governments and appellate courts to continue collecting
 the fee.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *