Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1150 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa, Schwertner S.B. No. 1150
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 May 6, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1150 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a provider protection plan that ensures efficiency and
 reduces administrative burdens on providers participating in a
 Medicaid managed care model or arrangement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 533, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 533.0055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 533.0055.  PROVIDER PROTECTION PLAN. (a)  The
 commission shall develop and implement a provider protection plan
 that is designed to reduce administrative burdens placed on
 providers participating in a Medicaid managed care model or
 arrangement implemented under this chapter and to ensure efficiency
 in provider enrollment and reimbursement.  The commission shall
 incorporate the measures identified in the plan, to the greatest
 extent possible, into each contract between a managed care
 organization and the commission for the provision of health care
 services to recipients.
 (b)  The provider protection plan required under this
 section must provide for:
 (1)  prompt payment and proper reimbursement of
 providers by managed care organizations;
 (2)  prompt and accurate adjudication of claims
 through:
 (A)  provider education on the proper submission
 of clean claims and on appeals;
 (B)  acceptance of uniform forms, including HCFA
 Forms 1500 and UB-92 and subsequent versions of those forms,
 through an electronic portal; and
 (C)  the establishment of standards for claims
 payments in accordance with a provider's contract;
 (3)  adequate and clearly defined provider network
 standards that are specific to provider type, including physicians,
 general acute care facilities, and other provider types defined in
 the commission's network adequacy standards in effect on January 1,
 2013, and that ensure choice among multiple providers to the
 greatest extent possible;
 (4)  a prompt credentialing process for providers;
 (5)  uniform efficiency standards and requirements for
 managed care organizations for the submission and tracking of
 preauthorization requests for services provided under the Medicaid
 program;
 (6)  establishment of an electronic process, including
 the use of an Internet portal, through which providers in any
 managed care organization's provider network may:
 (A)  submit electronic claims, prior
 authorization requests, claims appeals and reconsiderations,
 clinical data, and other documentation that the managed care
 organization requests for prior authorization and claims
 processing; and
 (B)  obtain electronic remittance advice,
 explanation of benefits statements, and other standardized
 reports;
 (7)  the measurement of the rates of retention by
 managed care organizations of significant traditional providers;
 (8)  the creation of a work group to review and make
 recommendations to the commission concerning any requirement under
 this subsection for which immediate implementation is not feasible
 at the time the plan is otherwise implemented, including the
 required process for submission and acceptance of attachments for
 claims processing and prior authorization requests through an
 electronic process under Subdivision (6) and, for any requirement
 that is not implemented immediately, recommendations regarding the
 expected:
 (A)  fiscal impact of implementing the
 requirement; and
 (B)  timeline for implementation of the
 requirement; and
 (9)  any other provision that the commission determines
 will ensure efficiency or reduce administrative burdens on
 providers participating in a Medicaid managed care model or
 arrangement.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as possible, but not later than September
 1, 2014, the Health and Human Services Commission shall implement
 the provider protection plan required under Section 533.0055,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *