Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1157 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1157


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the conveyance of certain state property for use by Sam
 Houston State University.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2014, the Texas
 Board of Criminal Justice shall convey to the Board of Regents of
 the Texas State University System for use by Sam Houston State
 University the real property described by Subsection (e) of this
 section.
 (b)  The Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall convey the
 property by deed without warranty regarding covenants of title.
 (c)  The deed must include a provision that:
 (1)  requires Sam Houston State University to use the
 property primarily for a governmental purpose; and
 (2)  indicates that title to the property will
 automatically revert to the Texas Board of Criminal Justice if Sam
 Houston State University fails to use the property primarily for a
 governmental purpose.
 (d)  The Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall retain custody
 of the deed after the deed is filed in the real property records of
 Walker County.
 (e)  The real property referred to in this section is
 described as follows:
 Being 82.0 acres, more or less, situated in the PLEASANT GRAY
 LEAGUE, Abstract No. 24, Walker County, Texas, and being out of and
 a part of the residue of a called 1401 acre and 515 acre tracts
 described in a Deed from Ed H. Cunningham and L. A. Ellis to the
 Governor of the State of Texas, dated July 10, 1883 and recorded in
 Volume Y, Page 181, Deed Records of Walker County, Texas, said 82.0
 acres being more definitely described by metes and bounds as
 follows:
 BEGINNING at the east corner of a called 5.0 acre tract as
 described in a Deed from the Texas Board of Criminal Justice on
 behalf of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice to the County of
 Walker, dated October 29, 2003 and recorded in Volume 595, Page 210
 of the Official Records of Walker County, Texas, a point for corner,
 said point being in the south right-of-way line of State Highway 75
 North and being the upper northwest corner of the herein described
 tract;
 THENCE S06°51'03"W, a distance of 375.56 feet to a 5 point for
 an ell corner of the herein described tract;
 THENCE S83°08'57"E, a distance of 659.92 feet to the west
 corner said 5.0 acre tract and being in the northeast line of a
 called 10.01 acres tract as described in a Deed from the State of
 Texas to Walker County, dated February 3, 2000 and recorded in
 Volume 417, Page 218, Official Records of Walker County, Texas, a
 point for corner;
 THENCE S29°35'00"E, with the northeast line of said 10.01 acre
 tract and a southwest line of the residue 1401 acre tract for a
 distance of 330.0 feet to a point for an angle corner of the herein
 described tract;
 THENCE S29°45'46"W, continuing with the common lines of the
 said 10.01 acre tract and the residue 1401 acre tract for a distance
 of 150.55 feet to a point for the south corner of said 10.01 acre
 tract and being in the northeast right-of-way line of Interstate
 Highway 45, said point being the west corner of the herein described
 tract;
 THENCE, S55°07'42"E, with the northeast right-of-way line of
 Interstate Highway 45 to a point for the west corner of Forest Hills
 Subdivision, Section 5 as recorded in Volume 1, Page 40-A of the
 Plat Records of Walker County, Texas, said point being the south
 corner of the herein described tract;
 THENCE N02°00'00"E, with the northeast line of said 1401 acre
 residue tract and the southwest lines of said Forest Hills
 Subdivisions , Section 5, the W.Y. Allen Subdivision, not recorded
 and the Woods Addition, not recorded, for an approximate distance
 of 2530.0 feet to a point in the south right-of-way of State Highway
 75 North and same being the northeast corner of the 82.0 acre tract
 herein described;
 THENCE with the south right-of-way line of State Highway 75
 North to the Place of Beginning.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.