Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB119 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 119
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2012; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 2, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 119 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of special student recovery programs by
 certain school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.117 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.117.  SPECIAL STUDENT RECOVERY PROGRAM. (a)  This
 section applies only to a school district with a student enrollment
 of at least 60,000 that is located in a county on the international
 border with a population of 800,000 or more.
 (b)  The commissioner may require a school district to which
 this section applies to operate a special student recovery program
 if the commissioner has imposed a sanction under Section 39.102
 based on a determination that the district has, for the purpose of
 affecting the performance rating under Section 39.054 or former
 Section 39.072 or a distinction designation under Section 39.202 or
 39.203 of the district or a campus in the district:
 (1)  assigned a student to a grade level to which the
 student would not otherwise be assigned, in violation of local
 policy;
 (2)  retained a student at a grade level at which the
 student would not otherwise be retained, in violation of local
 policy;
 (3)  declined to admit to the schools of the district a
 student with limited English proficiency who was eligible for
 admission; or
 (4)  encouraged a student who was eligible for
 admission to the district to enroll in another district or drop out
 of school.
 (c)  The commissioner shall require a school district to
 which this section applies to operate a special student recovery
 program if the superintendent or assistant superintendent of the
 district or a principal or assistant principal of a campus in the
 district is convicted of or receives a grant of deferred
 adjudication community supervision for an offense associated with
 conduct described by Subsection (b).
 (d)  A special student recovery program must include:
 (1)  identification of students affected by conduct
 described by Subsection (b), with an emphasis on identifying and
 obtaining current addresses for students who dropped out of school
 after the conduct;
 (2)  notification of students identified under
 Subdivision (1) of the availability of educational services
 provided through the program;
 (3)  provision of appropriate compensatory, intensive,
 and accelerated instructional services for students identified
 under Subdivision (1), including services designed to enable
 students to obtain high school equivalency certificates under
 Section 7.111; and
 (4)  for students identified under Subdivision (1) who
 are at least 21 years of age and under 26 years of age, the offer of
 admission to the schools of the district for the purpose of
 completing the requirements for a high school diploma, as
 authorized by Section 25.001.
 (e)  A student who is at least 21 years of age and is admitted
 to the schools of the district under Subsection (d)(4) is subject to
 the placement restrictions described by Section 25.001(b-2) if the
 student has not attended school in the three preceding school
 years.
 (f)  In addition to any other available funds, a school
 district may use funds provided to the district under Section
 42.152 to pay the costs of the program. Instructional services may
 be provided to students identified under Subsection (d)(1) who are
 under 26 years of age using funds provided under Section 42.152 or
 other Foundation School Program funds, notwithstanding Section
 42.003.
 (g)  This section requires a school district to provide
 instructional services only to a student who is a resident of this
 state and is eligible for admission to the schools of the district
 under Section 25.001, including eligibility described by that
 section for students who are under 26 years of age.
 (h)  The commissioner shall determine the duration of a
 special student recovery program, provided that the program must
 have a duration of at least two years. Before a program may be
 concluded, the district must conduct a public hearing in the
 community served by the school district to solicit comments from
 students, parents, and other members of the community regarding
 whether there is a continuing need for the program.
 (i)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 (j)  This section expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.117, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, authorizes or requires, as applicable, the commissioner of
 education to require a school district to operate a special student
 recovery program regardless of whether the district's conduct
 giving rise to the commissioner's action occurred before or after
 the effective date of this Act. The commissioner may waive
 operation of a program if the conduct occurred at least 10 years
 before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *