Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1195 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ellis, Zaffirini S.B. No. 1195
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 April 3, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 3, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a contract for the acquisition of goods or services to
 which The University of Texas M. D. Anderson Cancer Center is a
 party.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 73.115, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  In any contract for the acquisition of goods or services
 to which the institution is a party, a provision required by
 applicable law to be included in the contract is considered to be a
 part of the executed contract without regard to:
 (1)  whether the provision appears on the face of the
 contract; or
 (2)  whether the contract includes any provision to the
 contrary.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *