Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1226 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1226
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 8, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 8, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1226 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an employment-first policy and
 task force to promote competitive employment opportunities that
 provide a living wage for individuals with disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 531.02447 and 531.02448 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 531.02447.  EMPLOYMENT-FIRST POLICY.  (a)  It is the
 policy of the state that earning a living wage through competitive
 employment in the general workforce is the priority and preferred
 outcome for working-age individuals with disabilities who receive
 public benefits.
 (b)  The commission, the Texas Education Agency, and the
 Texas Workforce Commission shall jointly adopt and implement an
 employment-first policy in accordance with the state's policy under
 Subsection (a).  The policy must:
 (1)  affirm that an individual with a disability is
 able to meet the same employment standards as an individual who does
 not have a disability;
 (2)  ensure that all working-age individuals with
 disabilities, including young adults, are offered factual
 information regarding employment as an individual with a
 disability, including the relationship between an individual's
 earned income and the individual's public benefits;
 (3)  ensure that individuals with disabilities are
 given the opportunity to understand and explore options for
 education or training, including postsecondary, graduate, and
 postgraduate education, vocational or technical training, or other
 training, as pathways to employment;
 (4)  promote the availability and accessibility of
 individualized training designed to prepare an individual with a
 disability for the individual's preferred employment;
 (5)  promote partnerships with employers to overcome
 barriers to meeting workforce needs with the creative use of
 technology and innovation;
 (6)  ensure that the staff of public schools,
 vocational service programs, and community providers are trained
 and supported to assist in achieving the goal of competitive
 employment for all individuals with disabilities; and
 (7)  ensure that competitive employment, while being
 the priority and preferred outcome, is not required of an
 individual with a disability to secure or maintain public benefits
 for which the individual is otherwise eligible.
 Sec. 531.02448.  EMPLOYMENT-FIRST TASK FORCE.  (a)  The
 executive commissioner shall establish an interagency
 employment-first task force, or may use an existing committee or
 task force, to promote competitive employment of individuals with
 disabilities and the expectation that individuals with
 disabilities are able to meet the same employment standards,
 responsibilities, and expectations as any other working-age adult.
 (b)  If the executive commissioner establishes a task force
 for the purposes described by Subsection (a), the executive
 commissioner shall determine the number of members on the task
 force.  The executive commissioner shall appoint at least the
 following as members, subject to Subsection (e):
 (1)  an individual with a disability;
 (2)  a family member of an individual with a
 disability;
 (3)  a representative of the commission;
 (4)  a representative of the Department of Assistive
 and Rehabilitative Services;
 (5)  a representative of the Department of State Health
 Services;
 (6)  a representative of the Department of Aging and
 Disability Services;
 (7)  a representative of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services;
 (8)  a representative of the Texas Workforce
 Commission;
 (9)  a representative of the Texas Education Agency;
 (10)  an advocate for individuals with disabilities;
 and
 (11)  a representative of a provider of integrated and
 competitive employment services.
 (c)  A member of a task force established under this section
 serves at the will of the executive commissioner.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall designate a member of a
 task force established under this section to serve as presiding
 officer.
 (e)  At least one-third of a task force established under
 this section must be composed of individuals with disabilities, and
 no more than one-third of the task force may be composed of
 advocates for individuals with disabilities.
 (f)  A task force established under this section or an
 existing committee or task force used for purposes of this section
 shall:
 (1)  design an education and outreach process targeted
 at working-age individuals with disabilities, including young
 adults with disabilities, the families of those individuals, the
 state agencies listed in Subsection (b), and service providers,
 that is aimed at raising expectations of the success of individuals
 with disabilities in integrated, individualized, and competitive
 employment;
 (2)  develop recommendations for policy, procedure,
 and rules changes that are necessary to allow the employment-first
 policy described under Section 531.02447(b) to be fully
 implemented; and
 (3)  not later than September 1 of each even-numbered
 year, prepare and submit to the office of the governor, the
 legislature, and the executive commissioner a report regarding the
 task force's findings and recommendations, including:
 (A)  information that reflects the potential and
 actual impact of the employment-first policy on the employment
 outcomes for individuals with disabilities; and
 (B)  recommendations for improvement of
 employment services and outcomes, including employment rates, for
 individuals with disabilities based on the reported impact of an
 employment-first policy under Paragraph (A) that may include:
 (i)  recommendations relating to using any
 savings to the state resulting from the implementation of the
 employment-first policy to further improve the services and
 outcomes; and
 (ii)  recommendations developed under
 Subdivision (2) regarding necessary policy, procedure, and rules
 changes.
 (g)  A member of a task force established under this section
 is not entitled to compensation.  Members may be reimbursed for
 expenses as follows:
 (1)  a member described by Subsection (b)(1) or (2) is
 entitled to reimbursement for travel and other necessary expenses
 as provided in the General Appropriations Act;
 (2)  a member appointed as a representative of a state
 agency is eligible for reimbursement for travel and other necessary
 expenses according to the applicable agency's policies; and
 (3)  a member described by Subsection (b)(10) or (11)
 is entitled to reimbursement for travel and other necessary
 expenses to be paid equally out of available money appropriated to
 the commission and to health and human services agencies.
 (h)  The commission and the health and human services
 agencies shall provide administrative support and staff to a task
 force established under this section.
 (i)  The executive commissioner, the commissioner of
 education, and the Texas Workforce Commission shall evaluate
 recommendations made by a task force or committee under this
 section and adopt rules as necessary that are consistent with the
 employment-first policy adopted under Section 531.02447.
 (j)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2014, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 appoint the members of the employment-first task force under
 Section 531.02448, Government Code, as added by this Act, if the
 executive commissioner establishes a task force under that section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *