Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1253 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1253
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 8, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1253 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the relationship between Texas Department of
 Transportation toll projects and adjoining nontolled roads.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 228, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 228.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 228.014.  PROHIBITION ON DISINCENTIVES FOR ADJOINING
 NONTOLLED ROAD USE. (a)  The department may not take any action in
 designing, constructing, or operating a toll project under this
 chapter that incentivizes the use of the project and discourages
 the use of adjoining nontolled roads by violating sound engineering
 judgment in applying traffic controls on any adjoining nontolled
 roads, including by timing traffic signals to unnecessarily disrupt
 traffic flow on the adjoining nontolled roads.
 (b)  If existing nontolled lanes are reconstructed and
 operated as an adjacent road to a toll facility under Section
 228.201(a)(5), the reconstructed nontolled lanes must have access,
 function, and traffic control devices similar to those the lanes
 had before being reconstructed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *