Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1256 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 1256
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 9, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0; April 9, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1256 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for a sale to be considered a
 comparable sale for ad valorem tax purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.013, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), for a residential
 property in a county with a population of more than 150,000, a sale
 is not considered to be a comparable sale unless the sale occurred
 within 36 months of the date as of which the market value of the
 subject property is to be determined, regardless of the number of
 comparable properties sold during that period.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to the appraisal of
 property for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *