Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB126 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 126


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a mental health and substance abuse
 public reporting system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.078 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.078.  MENTAL HEALTH AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE PUBLIC
 REPORTING SYSTEM. (a)  The department, in collaboration with the
 commission, shall establish and maintain a public reporting system
 of performance and outcome measures relating to mental health and
 substance abuse services established by the Legislative Budget
 Board, the department, and the commission.  The system must allow
 external users to view and compare the performance, outputs, and
 outcomes of:
 (1)  community centers established under Subchapter A,
 Chapter 534, that provide mental health services;
 (2)  Medicaid managed care pilot programs that provide
 mental health services; and
 (3)  agencies, organizations, and persons that
 contract with the state to provide substance abuse services.
 (b)  The system must allow external users to view and compare
 the performance, outputs, and outcomes of the Medicaid managed care
 programs that provide mental health services.
 (c)  The department shall post the performance, output, and
 outcome measures on the department's website so that the
 information is accessible to the public.  The department shall post
 the measures quarterly or semiannually in accordance with when the
 measures are reported to the department.
 (d)  The department shall consider public input in
 determining the appropriate outcome measures to collect in the
 public reporting system. To the extent possible, the department
 shall include outcome measures that capture inpatient psychiatric
 care diversion, avoidance of emergency room use, criminal justice
 diversion, and the numbers of people who are homeless served.
 (e)  The commission shall conduct a study to determine the
 feasibility of establishing and maintaining the public reporting
 system, including, to the extent possible, the cost to the state and
 impact on managed care organizations and providers of collecting
 the outcome measures required by Subsection (d). Not later than
 December 1, 2014, the commission shall report the results of the
 study to the legislature and appropriate legislative committees.
 (f)  The department shall ensure that information reported
 through the public reporting system does not permit the
 identification of an individual.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2013, the Department
 of State Health Services shall establish the public reporting
 system as required under Section 1001.078, Health and Safety Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2014, the Department
 of State Health Services shall submit a report to the legislature
 and the Legislative Budget Board on the development of the public
 reporting system as required by Section 1001.078, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, and the outcome measures collected.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 126 passed the Senate on
 March 13, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 126 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor