Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1265 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 1265
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 8, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 8, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1265 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of board members for emergency services
 districts in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (h), Section 775.034, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (h)  This section does not apply to a district located wholly
 in a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than three million; or
 (2)  with a population of less than 200,000 that
 borders another state and the Gulf Intracoastal Waterway.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 775.0345, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0345.  ELECTION OF BOARD IN CERTAIN [POPULOUS]
 COUNTIES.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 775.0345, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a district located wholly
 in a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than three million; or
 (2)  with a population of less than 200,000 that
 borders another state and the Gulf Intracoastal Waterway.
 SECTION 4.  The heading to Section 775.0445, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0445.  VACANCY ON BOARD OF DISTRICT LOCATED IN
 CERTAIN [POPULOUS] COUNTIES.
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (b), Section 775.0445, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section applies only to a district located wholly
 in a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than three million; or
 (2)  with a population of less than 200,000 that
 borders another state and the Gulf Intracoastal Waterway.
 SECTION 6.  (a)  The changes in law made by this Act do not
 affect the entitlement of a commissioner of a board of emergency
 services commissioners serving on the board immediately before the
 effective date of this Act to continue to carry out the board's
 functions for the remainder of the commissioner's term.
 (b)  This Act does not prohibit a person who is a
 commissioner on the effective date of this Act and who was appointed
 under Section 775.034, Health and Safety Code, from running for
 election to the board if the person has the qualifications required
 for a member under Section 775.0345, Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 (c)  A person serving as a member of a board of emergency
 services commissioners on the effective date of this Act who was
 appointed under Section 775.034, Health and Safety Code, shall
 continue to serve until the election and qualification of a new
 commissioner for that position.
 (d)  In 2014, the county judge of a county with an emergency
 services district to which Subdivision (2), Subsection (a), Section
 775.0345, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, applies and
 to which Section 775.034, Health and Safety Code, previously
 applied, shall establish an election as required by Section
 775.0345 to replace a commissioner appointed before the effective
 date of this Act as near as practicable to the date of the
 expiration of the appointed commissioner's term.  A commissioner
 elected under this subsection serves a two-year term but the
 successor serves a four-year term as provided by Section 775.0345,
 Health and Safety Code.
 (e)  In 2015, the county judge shall repeat the procedures
 described by Subsection (d) of this section for the remaining
 appointed commissioners.  A commissioner elected under this
 subsection serves a three-year term but the successor serves a
 four-year term as provided by Section 775.0345, Health and Safety
 Code.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *