Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1280 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1280
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 11, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 11, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1280 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to attaining reserve capacity margins in power regions to
 meet expected peak demand.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.161 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.161.  POWER REGION RESERVE MARGIN. (a)  Not later
 than July 1 of each year, the independent organization certified
 under Section 39.151 for each power region shall study and project
 for the following year the:
 (1)  anticipated and installed generation capacity
 located in or capable of delivering electricity to the power
 region;
 (2)  expected peak demand in the power region; and
 (3)  amount of reserve capacity necessary to maintain a
 reliability standard set by the commission for the power region.
 (b)  If the independent organization determines under
 Subsection (a) that the amount of reserve capacity available for
 the following year will not maintain the reliability standard
 relative to the expected peak demand and a capacity deficit may
 occur, the organization shall acquire incremental capacity through
 opt-in load participation programs, with at least 20 percent of the
 incremental capacity being attained from each of the following
 classes:
 (1)  residential;
 (2)  commercial; and
 (3)  industrial.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *