Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1282 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan, Seliger S.B. No. 1282
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 2, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1282 By:  Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to deadlines for proposals for adoption by certain
 districts or authorities of desired future conditions of relevant
 aquifers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.108, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (d-5) to read as follows:
 (d-5)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d) and regardless of the
 date on which a proposal may have been voted on before September 1,
 2013, a proposal for the adoption of desired future conditions for
 the relevant aquifers within a management area is not required
 before May 1, 2016.  This subsection does not prevent districts in a
 management area from voting on a proposal for the adoption of
 desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within their
 management area before May 1, 2016.  This subsection expires
 January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *