By: Duncan, Seliger S.B. No. 1282 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 13, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources; April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 2, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1282 By: Duncan A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to deadlines for proposals for adoption by certain districts or authorities of desired future conditions of relevant aquifers. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 36.108, Water Code, is amended by adding Subsection (d-5) to read as follows: (d-5) Notwithstanding Subsection (d) and regardless of the date on which a proposal may have been voted on before September 1, 2013, a proposal for the adoption of desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within a management area is not required before May 1, 2016. This subsection does not prevent districts in a management area from voting on a proposal for the adoption of desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within their management area before May 1, 2016. This subsection expires January 1, 2018. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *