Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1282 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1282


 AN ACT
 relating to deadlines for proposals for adoption by certain
 districts or authorities of desired future conditions of relevant
 aquifers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.108, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (d-5) to read as follows:
 (d-5)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d) and regardless of the
 date on which a proposal may have been voted on before September 1,
 2013, a proposal for the adoption of desired future conditions for
 the relevant aquifers within a management area is not required
 before May 1, 2016.  This subsection does not prevent districts in a
 management area from voting on a proposal for the adoption of
 desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within their
 management area before May 1, 2016.  This subsection expires
 January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1282 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1282 passed the House on
 May 20, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor