S.B. No. 1282 AN ACT relating to deadlines for proposals for adoption by certain districts or authorities of desired future conditions of relevant aquifers. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 36.108, Water Code, is amended by adding Subsection (d-5) to read as follows: (d-5) Notwithstanding Subsection (d) and regardless of the date on which a proposal may have been voted on before September 1, 2013, a proposal for the adoption of desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within a management area is not required before May 1, 2016. This subsection does not prevent districts in a management area from voting on a proposal for the adoption of desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within their management area before May 1, 2016. This subsection expires January 1, 2018. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1282 passed the Senate on April 11, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1282 passed the House on May 20, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor