Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1289 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Williams S.B. No. 1289
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 28, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 28, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1289 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain business entities engaged in the publication of
 mug shots and other information regarding the involvement of an
 individual in the criminal justice system; providing a civil
 penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 5, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 109 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 109.  BUSINESS ENTITIES ENGAGED IN PUBLICATION OF CRIMINAL
 RECORD INFORMATION
 Sec. 109.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Criminal justice agency" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 411.082, Government Code.
 (2)  "Criminal record information" means information
 about a person's involvement in the criminal justice system. The
 term includes:
 (A)  a description or notation of any arrests, any
 formal criminal charges, and the dispositions of those criminal
 charges;
 (B)  a photograph of the person taken pursuant to
 an arrest or other involvement in the criminal justice system; and
 (C)  personal identifying information of a person
 displayed in conjunction with any other record of the person's
 involvement in the criminal justice system.
 (3)  "Personal identifying information" means
 information that alone or in conjunction with other information
 identifies a person, including a person's name, address, date of
 birth, photograph, and social security number or other
 government-issued identification number.
 (4)  "Publish" means to communicate or make information
 available to another person in writing or by means of
 telecommunications and includes communicating information on a
 computer bulletin board or similar system.
 Sec. 109.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter
 applies to a business entity that:
 (1)  publishes criminal record information, including
 information:
 (A)  originally obtained pursuant to a request for
 public information under Chapter 552, Government Code; or
 (B)  purchased or otherwise obtained by the entity
 or an affiliated business entity from the Department of Public
 Safety under Subchapter F, Chapter 411, Government Code; and
 (2)  requires the payment of a fee or other
 consideration to remove, correct, or modify criminal record
 information.
 Sec. 109.003.  DUTY TO PUBLISH COMPLETE AND ACCURATE
 CRIMINAL RECORD INFORMATION. (a)  A business entity must ensure
 that criminal record information the entity publishes is complete
 and accurate.
 (b)  For purposes of this chapter, criminal record
 information published by a business entity is considered:
 (1)  complete if the information reflects the notations
 of arrest and the filing and disposition of criminal charges, if
 applicable; and
 (2)  accurate if the information:
 (A)  reflects the most recent information
 received by the entity from the Department of Public Safety in
 accordance with Section 411.0851(b)(1)(B), Government Code; or
 (B)  was obtained by the entity from a law
 enforcement agency or criminal justice agency, including the
 Department of Public Safety, or any other governmental agency or
 entity within the 60-day period preceding the date of publication.
 Sec. 109.004.  DISPUTING COMPLETENESS OR ACCURACY OF
 INFORMATION. (a)  A business entity shall clearly and
 conspicuously publish an e-mail address, fax number, or mailing
 address to enable a person who is the subject of criminal record
 information published by the entity to dispute the completeness or
 accuracy of the information.
 (b)  If a business entity receives a dispute regarding the
 completeness or accuracy of criminal record information from a
 person who is the subject of the information, the business entity
 shall:
 (1)  verify with the appropriate law enforcement agency
 or criminal justice agency, including the Department of Public
 Safety, or any other governmental agency or entity, free of charge
 the disputed information; and
 (2)  complete the investigation described by
 Subdivision (1) not later than the 45th business day after the date
 on which the entity receives notice of the dispute.
 (c)  If a business entity finds incomplete or inaccurate
 criminal record information after conducting an investigation
 prescribed by this section, the entity shall promptly remove the
 inaccurate information from the website or other publication or
 shall promptly correct the information, as applicable. The entity
 may not:
 (1)  charge a fee to remove, correct, or modify
 incomplete or inaccurate information; or
 (2)  continue to publish incomplete or inaccurate
 information.
 (d)  A business entity shall provide written notice to the
 person who disputed the completeness or accuracy of information of
 the results of an investigation conducted under this section not
 later than the fifth business day after the date on which the
 investigation is completed.
 Sec. 109.005.  PUBLICATION OF CERTAIN CRIMINAL RECORD
 INFORMATION PROHIBITED; CIVIL LIABILITY. (a)  A person may not
 publish any criminal record information in the person's possession
 with respect to which the person has knowledge or has received
 notice that:
 (1)  an order of expunction has been issued under
 Article 55.02, Code of Criminal Procedure; or
 (2)  an order of nondisclosure has been issued under
 Section 411.081(d), Government Code.
 (b)  A person who publishes information in violation of
 Subsection (a) is liable to the individual who is the subject of the
 information in an amount not to exceed $500 for each separate
 violation and, in the case of a continuing violation, $500 for each
 subsequent day on which the violation occurs.
 (c)  In an action brought under this section, the court may
 grant injunctive relief to prevent or restrain a violation of this
 section.
 (d)  An individual who prevails in an action brought under
 this section is also entitled to recover court costs and reasonable
 attorney's fees.
 Sec. 109.006.  CIVIL PENALTY; INJUNCTION.  (a)  A business
 entity that publishes criminal record information in violation of
 this chapter is liable to the state for a civil penalty in an amount
 not to exceed $500 for each separate violation and, in the case of a
 continuing violation, $500 for each subsequent day on which the
 violation occurs.  For purposes of this subsection, each criminal
 record published in violation of this chapter constitutes a
 separate violation.
 (b)  The attorney general or an appropriate prosecuting
 attorney may sue to collect a civil penalty under this section.
 (c)  A civil penalty collected under this section shall be
 deposited in the state treasury to the credit of the general revenue
 fund.
 (d)  The attorney general may bring an action in the name of
 the state to restrain or enjoin a violation or threatened violation
 of this chapter.
 (e)  The attorney general or an appropriate prosecuting
 attorney is entitled to recover reasonable expenses incurred in
 obtaining injunctive relief or a civil penalty, or both, under this
 chapter, including court costs and reasonable attorney's fees.
 Sec. 109.007.  VENUE. An action under this chapter must be
 brought in a district court:
 (1)  in Travis County;
 (2)  in the county in which the person who is the
 subject of the criminal record information resides; or
 (3)  in the county in which the business entity is
 located.
 Sec. 109.008.  CUMULATIVE REMEDIES. The actions and
 remedies provided by this chapter are not exclusive and are in
 addition to any other action or remedy provided by law.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 109, Business & Commerce Code, as added
 by this Act, applies to any publication of criminal record
 information that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act,
 regardless of whether:
 (1)  the information relates to events or activities
 that occurred before, on, or after that date; or
 (2)  the information was initially published before
 that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *