Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1292 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ellis, Schwertner S.B. No. 1292
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 11, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 11, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1292 By:  Rodriguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to DNA testing of biological evidence in certain capital
 cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsections (i), (j), (k), (l), and (m) to read as
 follows:
 (i)  Before a defendant is tried for a capital offense in
 which the state is seeking the death penalty, the Department of
 Public Safety shall perform DNA testing, in accordance with the
 department's capabilities at the time the testing is performed, or
 have DNA tested by a laboratory accredited under Section 411.0205,
 Government Code, on all biological evidence that was collected as
 part of an investigation of the offense.  The Department of Public
 Safety shall pay for all DNA testing performed in accordance with
 this subsection.
 (j)  As soon as practicable after the defendant is charged
 with a capital offense, or on a motion by the state or the defendant
 in a capital case, the court shall order the state and the defendant
 to meet and confer about which biological materials collected as
 part of an investigation of the offense qualify as biological
 evidence that is required to be tested under Subsection (i).  If the
 state and the defendant agree on which biological materials
 constitute biological evidence, the biological evidence shall be
 tested in accordance with Subsection (i).  If the state and the
 defendant do not agree on which biological materials qualify as
 biological evidence, the state or the defendant may request the
 court to hold a hearing to determine the issue.  On receipt of a
 request for a hearing under this subsection, the court shall set a
 date for the hearing and provide written notice of the hearing date
 to the state and the defendant.  At the hearing, a request by the
 defendant to test biological material is prima facie evidence that
 the biological material constitutes biological evidence that is
 required to be tested under Subsection (i).
 (k)  If an item of biological evidence is destroyed as a
 result of DNA testing performed under Subsection (i), the
 laboratory that tested the evidence must provide to the defendant
 any documentation related to the testing of the evidence and the
 results of that testing.
 (l)  A defendant is not entitled to a new trial or to a new
 sentencing proceeding based solely on a violation of Subsection
 (i), (j), or (k).
 (m)  A defendant may have another laboratory accredited
 under Section 411.0205, Government Code, perform additional
 testing of any biological evidence required to be tested under
 Subsection (i).  On an ex parte showing of good cause to the court, a
 defendant may have a laboratory accredited under Section 411.0205,
 Government Code, perform testing of any biological material that is
 not required to be tested under Subsection (i).  The defendant is
 responsible for the cost of any testing performed under this
 subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Subsections (i), (j), (k), (l), and (m), Article
 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act, apply only
 to a trial that commences on or after the effective date of this
 Act, regardless of whether the alleged offense was committed
 before, on, or after that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *