Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1309 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Davis, Deuell S.B. No. 1309
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 18, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1309 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to assessment alternatives or accommodations for certain
 public school students in special education programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.023, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The agency, in conjunction with appropriate
 interested persons, shall redevelop assessment instruments adopted
 or developed under Subsection (b) for administration to
 significantly cognitively disabled students in a manner consistent
 with federal law. An assessment instrument under this subsection
 may not require a teacher to prepare tasks or materials for a
 student who will be administered such an assessment instrument.
 (b-2)  Assessment instruments redeveloped under Subsection
 (b-1) shall be administered beginning not later than the 2014-2015
 school year.  This subsection expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *