Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB131 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 131
 (In the Senate - Filed November 27, 2012; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the hours of sale and consumption of wine at a winery.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 105.08, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.08.  HOURS OF SALE AND CONSUMPTION: WINERY. The
 holder of a winery permit may sell, offer for sale, and deliver
 wine, and a person may consume wine on the premises of a winery:
 (1)  between 8 a.m. and midnight on any day except
 Sunday; [and]
 (2)  between 10 a.m. and midnight on Sunday; and
 (3)  between midnight and 2 a.m. on New Year's Day.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *