Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1316 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 1316
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 10, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 1; April 10, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of the offense of indecency with a
 child.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 21.11, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under this
 section that the actor:
 (1)  was not more than three years older than the victim
 [and of the opposite sex];
 (2)  did not use duress, force, or a threat against the
 victim at the time of the offense; and
 (3)  at the time of the offense:
 (A)  was not required under Chapter 62, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, to register for life as a sex offender; or
 (B)  was not a person who under Chapter 62 had a
 reportable conviction or adjudication for an offense under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *