Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1348 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1348
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 22, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1348 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain criminal offenses concerning the unlawful
 transfer or purchase of certain weapons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 46.06, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 46.06.  UNLAWFUL TRANSFER OR PURCHASE OF CERTAIN
 WEAPONS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 46.06, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (c), and (d) and adding Subsections
 (a-1), (e), and (f) to read as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if the person:
 (1)  sells, rents, leases, loans, or gives a firearm
 [handgun] to any person knowing that the person to whom the firearm
 [handgun] is to be delivered intends to use the firearm [it]
 unlawfully or in the commission of an unlawful act;
 (2)  purchases or offers to purchase a firearm with
 intent to deliver the firearm to a person knowing that the person to
 whom the firearm is to be delivered intends to use the firearm
 unlawfully or in the commission of an unlawful act; or
 (3)  knowingly makes a materially false or misleading
 statement in providing information to a person for purposes of
 complying with the national instant criminal background check
 system in the manner required by 18 U.S.C. Section 922.
 (a-1)  A person commits an offense if the person:
 (1) [(2)]  intentionally or knowingly sells, rents,
 leases, or gives or offers to sell, rent, lease, or give to any
 child younger than 18 years any firearm, club, or illegal knife;
 (2) [(3)]  intentionally, knowingly, or recklessly
 sells a firearm or ammunition for a firearm to any person who is
 intoxicated;
 (3) [(4)]  knowingly sells a firearm or ammunition for
 a firearm to any person who has been convicted of a felony before
 the fifth anniversary of the later of the following dates:
 (A)  the person's release from confinement
 following conviction of the felony; or
 (B)  the person's release from supervision under
 community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision following
 conviction of the felony;
 (4) [(5)]  sells, rents, leases, loans, or gives a
 handgun to any person knowing that an active protective order is
 directed to the person to whom the handgun is to be delivered; or
 (5) [(6)]  knowingly purchases, rents, leases, or
 receives as a loan or gift from another a handgun while an active
 protective order is directed to the actor.
 (c)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under
 Subsection (a-1)(1) [(a)(2)] that the transfer was to a minor whose
 parent or the person having legal custody of the minor had given
 written permission for the sale or, if the transfer was other than a
 sale, the parent or person having legal custody had given effective
 consent.
 (d)  An offense under Subsection (a) is a felony of the third
 degree.
 (e)  An offense under Subsection (a-1) [this section] is a
 Class A misdemeanor, except that an offense under Subsection
 (a-1)(1) [(a)(2)] is a state jail felony if the weapon that is the
 subject of the offense is a handgun.
 (f)  To the extent of any conflict between this section and a
 federal law related to the unlawful transfer or purchase of
 weapons, the federal law prevails.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 71.02, Penal Code, as
 amended by Chapters 68 (S.B. 934) and 223 (H.B. 260), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is reenacted and amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if, with the intent to
 establish, maintain, or participate in a combination or in the
 profits of a combination or as a member of a criminal street gang,
 the person commits or conspires to commit one or more of the
 following:
 (1)  murder, capital murder, arson, aggravated
 robbery, robbery, burglary, theft, aggravated kidnapping,
 kidnapping, aggravated assault, aggravated sexual assault, sexual
 assault, forgery, deadly conduct, assault punishable as a Class A
 misdemeanor, burglary of a motor vehicle, or unauthorized use of a
 motor vehicle;
 (2)  any gambling offense punishable as a Class A
 misdemeanor;
 (3)  promotion of prostitution, aggravated promotion
 of prostitution, or compelling prostitution;
 (4)  unlawful manufacture, transportation, repair, or
 sale of firearms or prohibited weapons;
 (5)  unlawful manufacture, delivery, dispensation, or
 distribution of a controlled substance or dangerous drug, or
 unlawful possession of a controlled substance or dangerous drug
 through forgery, fraud, misrepresentation, or deception;
 (5-a)  causing the unlawful delivery, dispensation, or
 distribution of a controlled substance or dangerous drug in
 violation of Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code;
 (6)  any unlawful wholesale promotion or possession of
 any obscene material or obscene device with the intent to wholesale
 promote the same;
 (7)  any offense under Subchapter B, Chapter 43,
 depicting or involving conduct by or directed toward a child
 younger than 18 years of age;
 (8)  any felony offense under Chapter 32;
 (9)  any offense under Chapter 36;
 (10)  any offense under Chapter 34, 35, or 35A;
 (11)  any offense under Section 37.11(a);
 (12)  any offense under Chapter 20A;
 (13)  any offense under Section 37.10;
 (14)  any offense under Section 38.06, 38.07, 38.09, or
 38.11;
 (15)  any offense under Section 42.10;
 (16)  any offense under Section 46.06(a) [46.06(a)(1)]
 or 46.14; [or]
 (17)  any offense under Section 20.05; or
 (18) [(17)]  any offense classified as a felony under
 the Tax Code.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 5.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *